Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1918 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15324 Week
» 68340 Month
» 187867 Year
» 3214720 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1816 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8816 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7686 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2587 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62587 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D67 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1956 off Grantham (35B) |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1920 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
05/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
03/1934 |
8" Piston Valves fitted |
03/1934 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed |
03/1934 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1934 |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1816 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1920 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8816 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: 8" Piston Valves fitted |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7686 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2587 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62587 |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62587 from Grantham (35B) |
|
|