|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Waiting cut up) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1817 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8817 | ||
05/1924 | Modification | Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted | ||
06/1927 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
05/1930 | Modification | Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted | ||
07/1934 | Modification | Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted | ||
07/1934 | Modification | Modification: 8" Piston Valves fitted | ||
07/1934 | Modification | Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed | ||
07/1934 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7687 but not taken up | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2588 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62588 | ||
06/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
21/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
19/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
20/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) | ||
08/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
13/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62588 from Cambridge (31A) | ||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |