Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 798 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18601 Week
» 71617 Month
» 191144 Year
» 3217997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
113 |
m/e |
10/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6913 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2262 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62262 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E827 |
Works Number |
5602 |
To Service |
During 10/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 19/10/1955 |
Service Life |
56 yrs , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1899 |
KEI |
|
Keith |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1947 |
Inverurie Works |
On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. |
SLS/194710 |
31/07/1951 |
G.N.O.S. Section - Keith |
In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. |
SLS/195109 |
31/07/1951 |
G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten |
The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. |
SLS/195109 |
14/06/1952 |
Scottish Miscellany |
On a trip round the north, quite a variety of locomotives was noted, 55218 was on Aberfeldy Br., No. 44931 was pilot to 54500, 54494 on Up pass. at Murthly and 54467 at Pitlochry. No. 62262 was shunting at Elgin, 54473/82 at Forres, and at Inverness 54445/63/70/1/84 an 57634, 57954 an 73007. 55051 was at Dornoch and it is said locally that C.E. Dept. is to consider possibility of C.R. 0-4-4T as branch engine is getting worn-out. Helmsdale provided 54495, 57587 an 55053, the Dornoch Branch spare engine. Kyle of Lochalsh had only Class 5 LM 4-6-0. The early morning mixed train from Kyle to Dingwall is generally a LM 5MT, brake composite and a string of wagons. Bl, No. 61140 with self-weighing tender is due in Scotland for test purposes. 'Clan' Class engines have been noted working to Stirling and probably beyond. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 113 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5602 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6913 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2262 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62262 |
|
|
19/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62262 |
|
|