Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 67 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17870 Week
» 70886 Month
» 190413 Year
» 3217266 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
36 |
m/e |
08/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6836 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2272 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62272 |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Inverurie Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 08/1910 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs , 8 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1910 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61503, 62272/75, 64496, 4505, 64536, 65242, 5329, ex-L.M.S. 15224, 16278, 17347, 17460, 17611. |
SLS/195002 |
19/03/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
In the yard on 19/3 were 'B.12' No. 61539, 'D.40' No. 62272, 'D.31' No. 62282 (Condemned, built Cowlairs 1890), 'J.36' No. 65294, 'J.72' No. 68717 and '2F' No. 57260 (built Neilson 1884). |
SLS/195004 |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 36 Built at Inverurie Works |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6836 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2272 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62272 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62272 |
|
|
04/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|