Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3981 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17387 Week
» 70403 Month
» 189930 Year
» 3216783 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
48 |
m/e |
10/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6848 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2276 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62276 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1920 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/08/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/03/1952 |
Easter Workings on the Buchan line |
With the arrival of the new Class 4MT 2-6-4 tanks at Kittybrewster, some of the turns on the Buchan section have been taken over by the new locomotives. 80020 works the 11.22 No. 1 Express-the 'Fisher' -from Fraserburgh to Kittybrewster while 80029 handles the 16.02 passenger Aberdeen-Fraserburgh. However, many of the Aberdeen-Fraserburgh trains are still worked by locomotives of the old D40, D41, B1 or B12 classes. A B1 is in charge of the 12.25 passenger from Fraserburgh and 62260, 62276 'Andrew Bain' or 62279 'Glen Grant' deals with the 12.50 goods to Kittybrewster. But the most startling change has taken place on the St. Combs Light Railway. Here Class 2MT 2-6-0, No. 46460, shedded at 64A, has been fitted with cowcatchers 'fore and aft' (to use a nautical phrase) and has taken over the duties previously performed by ex-G.E.R. 2-4-2 tanks 67151 an 67164, both of which have been scrapped. But 67157, of the same class, still lingers on and shares duties with the new engine. The crews consider that 46460 is an excellent machine, but I was informed that, some time after its arrival, it was reported for working 10lb. over pressure! |
SLS/195206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 48, name: ANDREW BAIN Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22562 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6848 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2276 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62276 |
|
|
11/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62276 |
|
|