Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1703 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19506 Week
» 72522 Month
» 192049 Year
» 3218902 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
45 |
m/e |
06/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6845 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2273 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62273 |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Inverurie Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 14/01/1955 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1921 |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/01/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/01/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 61508/21, 62273, 4483, 64490, ex-L.M.S. 15144, 15222/66, 56326, 17235/55, 57289. |
SLS/195003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 45, name: GEORGE DAVIDSON Built at Inverurie Works |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6845 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2273 |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62273 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
14/01/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62273 |
|
|
02/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|