Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1407 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19210 Week
» 72226 Month
» 191753 Year
» 3218606 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
46 |
m/e |
09/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6846 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2274 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62274 |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
09/1921 |
BENACHIE |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Inverurie Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 09/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/09/1955 |
Service Life |
34 yrs , 20 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
4w/e |
10/07/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 46, name: BENACHIE Built at Inverurie Works |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6846 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2274 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
07/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62274 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
07/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
20/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62274 |
|
|