Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1590 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14996 Week
» 68012 Month
» 187539 Year
» 3214392 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
83 |
m/e |
12/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6883 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2230 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62230 |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill |
Class |
D41 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E711 |
Works Number |
4645 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 88 | Train Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 18/03/1952 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1893 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
23/12/1950 |
61C |
|
Keith |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/03/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/03/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1914 |
Steam heating apparatus |
07/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1951 |
G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten |
The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. |
SLS/195109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 83 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4645 |
|
|
10/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heating apparatus |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6883 |
|
|
07/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2230 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62230 |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
18/03/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62230 |
|
|