Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3074 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16480 Week
» 69496 Month
» 189023 Year
» 3215876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2759 |
|
05/1929 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2734 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62734 |
y/e |
1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2759, name: CUMBERLAND Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1443 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2734 |
|
|
1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62734 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
17/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
15/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) |
|
|
03/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62734 |
|
|