Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4022 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22933 Week
» 87887 Month
» 290551 Year
» 3317404 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
201 |
|
20/04/1932 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2736 |
|
04/1946 |
British Railways |
62736 |
on |
04/10/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
20/04/1932 |
GHD |
|
Gateshead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
YK |
|
York (North) |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
50D |
|
Starbeck |
4w/e |
21/10/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/06/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
YK |
York (North) |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 201, name: THE BRAMHAM MOOR Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1546 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2736 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
04/10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62736 |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
19/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62736 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|