Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4285 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13859 Week
» 78813 Month
» 281477 Year
» 3308330 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
273 |
|
12/10/1932 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2744 |
|
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62744 |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Wed 14/03/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1954 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. |
SLS/195404 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/10/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 273, name: THE HOLDERNESS Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1560 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2744 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62744 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
30/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62744 |
|
|
14/03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|