Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3493 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16899 Week
» 69915 Month
» 189442 Year
» 3216295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
292 |
|
23/08/1933 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2748 |
|
01/1947 |
British Railways |
62748 |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
23/08/1933 |
NEV |
|
Neville Hill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/12/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/04/1954 |
Wetherby Races, Easter Monday |
Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. |
SLS/195406 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 292, name: THE SOUTHWOLD Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1574 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2748 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
11/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62748 |
|
|
17/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62748 |
|
|
01/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|