Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 657 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18460 Week
» 71476 Month
» 191003 Year
» 3217856 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
297 |
|
30/08/1933 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2749 |
|
07/1946 |
British Railways |
62749 |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SCA |
Scarborough |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
SBK |
Starbeck |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/07/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/08/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 297, name: THE COTTESMORE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1575 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2749 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62749 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
02/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62749 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|