Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1803 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15209 Week
» 68225 Month
» 187752 Year
» 3214605 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
368 |
|
12/12/1934 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2770 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62770 |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SCA |
Scarborough |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
on |
13/09/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1957 |
Whitby MPD |
In store are 62731/5/55/9/62/4/70/2/5 an 69864/5/81. |
SLS/195711 |
13/09/1959 |
Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed |
The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. |
SLS/195911 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 368, name: THE PUCKERIDGE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1606 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2770 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62770 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
23/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62770 |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|