Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2309 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15715 Week
» 68731 Month
» 188258 Year
» 3215111 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
676 |
m/e |
01/1886 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7676 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
E16 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1886 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1926 |
Service Life |
40 yrs , 1 mth |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1896 |
160lb Boiler fitted |
10/1896 |
17½" Cylinders fitted |
10/1896 |
Stephenson Valve Gear fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1886 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 676 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
10/1896 |
Modification |
Modification: 160lb Boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1896 |
Modification |
Modification: 17½" Cylinders fitted |
|
|
10/1896 |
Modification |
Modification: Stephenson Valve Gear fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7676 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7676 |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
12/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
16/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|