Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4288 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17694 Week
» 70710 Month
» 190237 Year
» 3217090 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
781 |
m/e |
10/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7781 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7194 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67194 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D58 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1956 |
Service Life |
52 yrs |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 781 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7781 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7194 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67194 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67194 |
|
|