Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3573 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22484 Week
» 87438 Month
» 290102 Year
» 3316955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
238 |
m/e |
07/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7238 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I60 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1906 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1929 |
Service Life |
23 yrs |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1906 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
07/1929 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
BURY |
|
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
22/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
BSE |
Bury St Edmunds |
w/e |
29/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
BURY |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 238 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7238 |
|
|
07/1929 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7238 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|