Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1193 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14599 Week
» 67615 Month
» 187142 Year
» 3213995 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
584 |
m/e |
05/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7584 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7158 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
67158 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D63 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1907 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Tue 13/01/1953 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
on |
23/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
03/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/01/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 584 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7584 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7158 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
03/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67158 |
|
|
13/01/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67158 |
|
|