Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1500 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19303 Week
» 72319 Month
» 191846 Year
» 3218699 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
186 |
m/e |
01/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7186 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7177 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67177 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A65 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/03/1951 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 186 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7186 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7177 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
03/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67177 |
|
|
12/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67177 |
|
|