Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 655 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18458 Week
» 71474 Month
» 191001 Year
» 3217854 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
69 |
m/e |
06/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7069 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7228 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67228 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G69 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/04/1958 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 69 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7069 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7228 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67228 |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67228 |
|
|