Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2932 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16338 Week
» 69354 Month
» 188881 Year
» 3215734 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7007 |
y/e |
c. 0 |
Great Eastern Railway |
7 |
m/e |
12/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7236 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67236 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A71 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 17/08/1955 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
KL |
Kings Lynn |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
BURY |
|
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/08/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7007 |
|
|
12/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 7 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
09/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7236 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67236 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
17/08/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67236 |
|
|