Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4034 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17440 Week
» 70456 Month
» 189983 Year
» 3216836 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
405 |
m/e |
10/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7277 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67277 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A209 |
To Service |
During 10/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/10/1957 |
Service Life |
61 yrs , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1896 |
BLA |
|
Blaydon |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52F |
|
Blyth (North) |
5w/e |
18/12/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/10/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/10/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 405 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7277 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67277 |
|
|
18/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
22/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67277 |
|
|