Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1568 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19371 Week
» 72387 Month
» 191914 Year
» 3218767 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1739 |
m/e |
10/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7302 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67302 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A218 |
To Service |
During 10/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 10/04/1956 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1897 |
WBY |
|
Whitby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
NEV |
|
Neville Hill |
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
WBY |
|
Whitby |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/04/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
WBY |
Whitby |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1739 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7302 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Whitby (WBY) |
|
|
01/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67302 |
|
|
10/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67302 |
|
|