Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 161 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17964 Week
» 70980 Month
» 190507 Year
» 3217360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1745 |
m/e |
10/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7303 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67303 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A218 |
To Service |
During 10/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 23/02/1953 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1897 |
HTN |
|
Heaton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
TWD |
|
Tweedmouth |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1953 |
Darlington Works |
Nos. 78006/7/8/9 are in traffic. Can anyone confirm that they carry 1952 plates? No. 46478 has been in for intermediate and repaint. Nos. 67291, 67303/31 an 62373 have been condemned. The old shed at Ferryhill has been demolished: since the closure-16 years ago-a few engines on stock have been stored there, the last being Nos. 67278, 62359 an 62365, taken away about two years ago. 'J21' No. 65070 has received a full repair. |
SLS/195306 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1745 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7303 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67303 |
|
|
23/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67303 |
|
|