Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1502 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14908 Week
» 67924 Month
» 187451 Year
» 3214304 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2087 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7316 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67316 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A281 |
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/12/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs , 13 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
on |
29/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
52CHEX |
|
w/e |
21/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2087 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
12/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7316 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67316 |
|
|
29/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
13/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67316 |
|
|