|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 20/03/1924 | 28/05/1924 | 70 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/11/1925 | 05/02/1926 | 75 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/10/1927 | 15/12/1927 | 71 days | General | Boiler number D1067 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/11/1929 | 24/12/1929 | 48 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/05/1932 | 04/07/1932 | 55 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1933 | 22/06/1933 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1934 | 30/08/1934 | 101 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number D1022 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1934 | 06/09/1934 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 60 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1936 | 29/07/1936 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1938 | 25/08/1938 | 58 days | General | Boiler number D1103 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1938 | 09/09/1938 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1940 | 17/10/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1941 | 15/10/1941 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1943 | 15/02/1944 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1946 | 04/10/1946 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2463 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9866 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1947 | 05/12/1947 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1948 | 11/06/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69866 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1948 | 29/06/1948 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1950 | 31/03/1950 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1951 | 24/03/1951 | 34 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24700 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1953 | 03/09/1953 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1954 | 30/11/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1955 | 18/02/1955 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1955 | 13/07/1955 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1956 | 17/04/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24755 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/10/1957 | Saltburn MPD | Owing to institution of diesel services only five locos. are allocated here viz. A8's 69866/9/80/92/4. | SLS/195711 |
19/04/1958 | Saltburn MPD | The allocation of this shed (transferred to Middlesbrough 3rd Feb.) are in store here, viz.: 69830/1/3/42/66/9. | SLS/195805 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1914 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2159 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
20/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1924. Dep: 28/05/1924. | ||
23/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1925. Dep: 05/02/1926. | ||
06/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1927. Dep: 15/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1067 (Diagram 63) |
||
07/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1929. Dep: 24/12/1929. | ||
11/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1932. Dep: 04/07/1932. | ||
16/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1933. Dep: 22/06/1933. | ||
22/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 22/05/1934. Dep: 30/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1022 (Diagram 63) |
||
30/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
02/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1934. Dep: 06/09/1934. | ||
20/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. | ||
28/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1936. Dep: 29/07/1936. | ||
08/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
29/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1938. Dep: 25/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1103 (Diagram 63) |
||
30/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1938. Dep: 09/09/1938. | ||
05/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1940. Dep: 17/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A) |
||
09/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1941. Dep: 15/10/1941. | ||
29/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1943. Dep: 15/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
22/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1946. Dep: 04/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2463 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9866 |
||
04/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947. | ||
12/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69866 |
||
22/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1948. Dep: 29/06/1948. | ||
11/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
08/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1950. Dep: 31/03/1950. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
19/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 24/03/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24700 (Diagram 63B) |
||
20/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 20/05/1952. | ||
06/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/08/1953. Dep: 03/09/1953. | ||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
23/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1954. Dep: 30/11/1954. | ||
15/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 18/02/1955. | ||
06/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1955. Dep: 13/07/1955. | ||
14/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1956. Dep: 17/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24755 (Diagram 63B) |
||
02/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
18/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69866 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |