|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/11/1923 | 07/02/1924 | 95 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1925 | 11/09/1925 | 114 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1927 | 09/09/1927 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1929 | 24/05/1929 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1930 | 08/12/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1930 | 31/12/1930 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1932 | 03/01/1933 | 211 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1935 | 05/04/1935 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1936 | 24/12/1936 | 67 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1936 | 12/01/1937 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1938 | 14/03/1939 | 114 days | General | Boiler number D1313 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1939 | 20/04/1939 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1939 | 04/05/1939 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1941 | 23/10/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1941 | 10/11/1941 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1944 | 19/02/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1944 | 02/03/1944 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1945 | 03/09/1945 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1946 | 16/12/1946 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/03/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1948 | 07/04/1948 | 55 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69875 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1948 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1950 | 21/06/1950 | 31 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1952 | 23/08/1952 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 24690 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1954 | 23/11/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24716 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1956 | 02/11/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24724 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1528 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Starbeck (SBK) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
05/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1923. Dep: 07/02/1924. | ||
21/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1925. Dep: 11/09/1925. | ||
16/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1927. Dep: 09/09/1927. | ||
14/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1929. Dep: 24/05/1929. | ||
20/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1930. Dep: 08/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63) |
||
22/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930. | ||
07/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 07/06/1932. Dep: 03/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A) |
||
29/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1935. Dep: 05/04/1935. | ||
19/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1936. Dep: 24/12/1936. | ||
30/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1936. Dep: 12/01/1937. | ||
21/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1938. Dep: 14/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1313 (Diagram 63) |
||
30/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1939. Dep: 20/04/1939. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
25/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1939. Dep: 04/05/1939. | ||
15/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1941. Dep: 23/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C) |
||
31/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1941. Dep: 10/11/1941. | ||
21/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) |
||
23/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1944. Dep: 02/03/1944. | ||
03/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/05/1945. | ||
31/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1945. Dep: 03/09/1945. | ||
23/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A) |
||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9875 | ||
06/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1946. Dep: 16/12/1946. | ||
27/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. | ||
13/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1948. Dep: 07/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69875 |
||
29/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/04/1948. | ||
20/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
26/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
22/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1950. Dep: 21/06/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 63B) |
||
14/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1952. Dep: 23/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24690 (Diagram 63A) |
||
02/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/06/1954. | ||
20/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1954. Dep: 23/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24716 (Diagram 63A) |
||
25/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1956. Dep: 02/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24724 (Diagram 63B) |
||
22/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
20/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69875 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |