|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 19/01/1923 | 09/04/1923 | 81 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/07/1924 | 02/10/1924 | 67 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/02/1926 | 15/06/1926 | 119 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/03/1928 | 24/05/1928 | 62 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/09/1928 | 17/10/1928 | 23 days | Light Repair | After derailment |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/11/1928 | 12/12/1928 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/07/1929 | 22/07/1929 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/05/1930 | 10/07/1930 | 52 days | General | Boiler number D290 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1933 | 23/01/1934 | 105 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number 2468 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1935 | 15/11/1935 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1937 | 14/12/1937 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1938 | 01/09/1938 | 65 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2376 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1940 | 24/06/1940 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1942 | 25/02/1942 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1944 | 24/04/1944 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1946 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1947 | 10/10/1947 | 129 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1949 | 05/05/1949 | 32 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 69880 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1950 | 10/02/1950 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1950 | 21/03/1950 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1950 | 10/06/1950 | 33 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1952 | 19/09/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24740 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1955 | 04/05/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 24738 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1957 | 04/05/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24697 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1957 | 18/06/1957 | 26 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
31/10/1957 | Saltburn MPD | Owing to institution of diesel services only five locos. are allocated here viz. A8's 69866/9/80/92/4. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1501 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
19/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1923. Dep: 09/04/1923. | ||
28/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1924. Dep: 02/10/1924. | ||
17/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1926. Dep: 15/06/1926. | ||
24/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 24/05/1928. | ||
25/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1928. Dep: 17/10/1928. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
16/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1928. Dep: 12/12/1928. | ||
11/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1929. Dep: 22/07/1929. | ||
20/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1930. Dep: 10/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D290 (Diagram 63) |
||
11/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 11/10/1933. Dep: 23/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2468 (Diagram 63A) |
||
19/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
22/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
24/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
30/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1935. Dep: 15/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A) |
||
25/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1937. Dep: 14/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63) |
||
29/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1938. Dep: 01/09/1938. | ||
15/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2376 (Diagram 63) |
||
11/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 24/06/1940. | ||
05/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (MAL) | ||
20/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1942. Dep: 25/02/1942. | ||
05/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
21/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1944. Dep: 24/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A) |
||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1946. | ||
30/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9880 | ||
04/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947. | ||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
11/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
04/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 05/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69880 |
||
07/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1950. Dep: 10/02/1950. | ||
15/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1950. Dep: 21/03/1950. | ||
09/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1950. Dep: 10/06/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B) |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
25/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24740 (Diagram 63B) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
09/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. | ||
22/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1955. Dep: 04/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24738 (Diagram 63B) |
||
04/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24697 (Diagram 63B) |
||
24/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1957. Dep: 18/06/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
23/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69880 from West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
07/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |