|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/12/1923 | 22/02/1924 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1924 | 21/03/1924 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1925 | 19/02/1925 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1925 | 31/12/1925 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1928 | 14/06/1928 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1928 | 25/10/1928 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1929 | 18/07/1929 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1929 | 17/02/1930 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1931 | 20/02/1931 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1932 | 18/08/1932 | 130 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1932 | 19/10/1932 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1934 | 09/08/1934 | 141 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number D1287 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1934 | 07/09/1934 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1936 | 13/06/1936 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1937 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1938 | 09/06/1938 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1938 | 21/06/1938 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1940 | 05/09/1940 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1943 | 10/04/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2662 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1945 | 07/06/1945 | 126 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1947 | 12/09/1947 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 24 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69883 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1949 | 26/09/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1949 | 17/11/1949 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1951 | 06/09/1951 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 24710 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1951 | 12/09/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1954 | 16/10/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24767 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1957 | 11/02/1957 | 28 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1957 | 02/08/1957 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1957 | 14/08/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1957 | Sunderland MPD | This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. | SLS/195711 |
13/12/1958 | Durham MPD | This shed (sub to Sunderland) was closed as from 13th December, 1958, and its two remaining A8s 69873/83 transferred to store at Sunderland. Banking at Durham is now performed by a V1/3 which comes daily from Sunderland. | SLS/195902 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1524 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
10/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1923. Dep: 22/02/1924. | ||
05/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/03/1924. Dep: 21/03/1924. | ||
13/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1925. Dep: 19/02/1925. | ||
12/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925. | ||
03/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1928. Dep: 14/06/1928. | ||
24/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/09/1928. Dep: 25/10/1928. | ||
09/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1929. Dep: 18/07/1929. | ||
27/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1929. Dep: 17/02/1930. | ||
29/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1931. Dep: 20/02/1931. | ||
11/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1932. Dep: 18/08/1932. | ||
29/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1932. Dep: 19/10/1932. | ||
22/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 22/03/1934. Dep: 09/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1287 (Diagram 63) |
||
24/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1934. Dep: 07/09/1934. | ||
22/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
24/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/09/1937. | ||
25/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1938. Dep: 09/06/1938. | ||
09/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1938. Dep: 21/06/1938. | ||
16/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middleton in Teesdale (Dar) | ||
22/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
22/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1940. Dep: 05/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A) |
||
08/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2662 (Diagram 63A) |
||
02/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/02/1945. Dep: 07/06/1945. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9883 | ||
28/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Dep: 12/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A) |
||
04/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69883 |
||
29/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/08/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. | ||
17/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1949. Dep: 26/09/1949. | ||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 17/11/1949. | ||
11/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
25/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1951. Dep: 06/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24710 (Diagram 63B) |
||
10/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1951. Dep: 12/09/1951. | ||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
09/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
01/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
14/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
13/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24767 (Diagram 63B) |
||
15/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1957. Dep: 11/02/1957. | ||
17/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/06/1957. Dep: 02/08/1957. | ||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 14/08/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Durham (54a) | ||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69883 from Sunderland (52G) |