|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/01/1924 | 31/03/1924 | 76 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1925 | 09/12/1925 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1927 | 14/11/1927 | 91 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1927 | 08/12/1927 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1929 | 05/07/1929 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1929 | 16/10/1929 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1931 | 17/02/1931 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1931 | 31/03/1931 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1933 | 02/03/1933 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1102 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1934 | 10/08/1934 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1934 | 09/03/1935 | 88 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1937 | 05/04/1937 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1939 | 08/06/1939 | 102 days | General | Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1941 | 31/01/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3069 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1944 | 16/12/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3050 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/01/1949 | 27/01/1949 | 25 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 69894 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1950 | 30/09/1950 | 33 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24684 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1950 | 05/10/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1950 | 17/10/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1950 | 09/11/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1953 | 05/03/1953 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24760 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1955 | 15/07/1955 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1957 | 12/07/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24719 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1957 | 19/07/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1957 | Saltburn MPD | Owing to institution of diesel services only five locos. are allocated here viz. A8's 69866/9/80/92/4. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1922 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1530 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Starbeck (SBK) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
16/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1924. Dep: 31/03/1924. | ||
21/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1925. Dep: 09/12/1925. | ||
16/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1927. Dep: 14/11/1927. | ||
01/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1927. Dep: 08/12/1927. | ||
29/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1929. Dep: 05/07/1929. | ||
02/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1929. Dep: 16/10/1929. | ||
05/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1931. Dep: 17/02/1931. | ||
17/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1931. Dep: 31/03/1931. | ||
20/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1933. Dep: 02/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1102 (Diagram 63) |
||
02/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1934. Dep: 10/08/1934. | ||
12/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 12/12/1934. Dep: 09/03/1935. | ||
30/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
15/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1937. Dep: 05/04/1937. | ||
27/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1939. Dep: 08/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B) |
||
24/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1941. Dep: 31/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3069 (Diagram 63B) |
||
19/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
17/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3050 (Diagram 63B) |
||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9894 | ||
17/10/1947 | Modification | Diagram 63B number 3369 boiler fitted | ||
03/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1949. Dep: 27/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69894 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
29/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24684 (Diagram 63B) |
||
02/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1950. Dep: 05/10/1950. | ||
16/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 17/10/1950. | ||
31/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1950. Dep: 09/11/1950. | ||
19/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
25/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
19/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1953. Dep: 05/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24760 (Diagram 63B) |
||
07/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1955. Dep: 15/07/1955. | ||
13/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1957. Dep: 12/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24719 (Diagram 63B) |
||
15/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/07/1957. Dep: 19/07/1957. | ||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
23/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69894 from West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
07/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
15/07/1965 | Modification | Diagram 63A number 24688 boiler fitted |