Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1393 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19196 Week
» 72212 Month
» 191739 Year
» 3218592 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
522 |
m/e |
09/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3522 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4171 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64171 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
266 |
Works Number |
1312 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 20/09/1961 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1911 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40F |
|
Boston |
4w/e |
08/01/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/09/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1941 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/05/1958 |
Spalding MPD |
Spalding, ex M. & G.N. shed is no longer supplied by New England but by Boston. On 11th May the following were on shed-D2234, 43059/ 61/2/4/5/80/3/5, 61756, 64171/2/91, 64231 /78 an 68560 all of Boston (40F). |
SLS/195806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 522 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1312 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3522 |
|
|
06/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4171 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64171 |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
20/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64171 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|