Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4533 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23444 Week
» 88398 Month
» 291062 Year
» 3317915 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
524 |
m/e |
10/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3524 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4173 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64173 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
266 |
Works Number |
1314 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 11/01/1961 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1911 |
COP |
|
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
56B |
|
Ardsley |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/01/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
on |
14/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
26/11/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 524 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1314 |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3524 |
|
|
01/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4173 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64173 |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64173 |
|
|