Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14418 Week
» 67434 Month
» 186961 Year
» 3213814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
565 |
m/e |
08/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3565 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4214 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64214 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
273 |
Works Number |
1400 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/10/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1913 |
ARD |
|
Ardsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40F |
|
Boston |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
40F |
|
Boston |
5w/e |
23/06/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1939 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 565 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1400 |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3565 |
|
|
11/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4214 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64214 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
19/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64214 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|