Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1893 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19696 Week
» 72712 Month
» 192239 Year
» 3219092 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
591 |
m/e |
10/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3591 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4240 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64240 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
1451 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/08/1960 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1914 |
HIT |
|
Hitchin (GNR) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/08/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
11/06/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1941 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 591 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1451 |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3591 |
|
|
12/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4240 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64240 |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64240 |
|
|