Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 781 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14187 Week
» 67203 Month
» 186730 Year
» 3213583 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
623 |
m/e |
12/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3623 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4262 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64262 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
287 |
Works Number |
1504 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/02/1959 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 623 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1504 |
|
|
06/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3623 |
|
|
04/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4262 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64262 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
16/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64262 |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|