Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 171 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17974 Week
» 70990 Month
» 190517 Year
» 3217370 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
628 |
m/e |
03/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3628 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4267 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64267 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
287 |
Works Number |
1510 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/07/1958 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1920 |
ARD |
|
Ardsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
5w/e |
21/01/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/07/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ARD |
Ardsley |
on |
24/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/07/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1939 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 628 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1510 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3628 |
|
|
12/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4267 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64267 |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
28/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64267 |
|
|
10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|