Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
633 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3633 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4272 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64272 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
291 |
Works Number |
1534 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 02/09/1959 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1921 |
ARD |
|
Ardsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40F |
|
Boston |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
40F |
|
Boston |
5w/e |
23/06/1951 |
35A |
|
New England |
5w/e |
21/03/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/09/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1939 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 633 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1534 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3633 |
|
|
06/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4272 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64272 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
02/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64272 |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|