Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3941 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17347 Week
» 70363 Month
» 189890 Year
» 3216743 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
851 |
|
05/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5851 |
|
10/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5171 |
|
03/1946 |
British Railways |
65171 |
|
14/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3769 |
To Service |
During 05/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/10/1956 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1897 |
9E |
|
Trafford Park (LMS) |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
06/10/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
31/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 851 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3769 |
|
|
10/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5851 |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5171 |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65171 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65171 |
|
|