Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4053 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17459 Week
» 70475 Month
» 190002 Year
» 3216855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
122 |
|
02/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5122 |
|
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5196 |
|
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65196 |
|
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 02/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/06/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 122 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5122 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5196 |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65196 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (53E) |
|
|
02/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65196 |
|
|