Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4116 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17522 Week
» 70538 Month
» 190065 Year
» 3216918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
211 |
m/e |
10/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5211 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4336 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
64336 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4528 |
To Service |
During 10/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/07/1959 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1934 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 211 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4528 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5211 |
|
|
09/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4336 |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64336 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
13/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64336 |
|
|