Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 780 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14186 Week
» 67202 Month
» 186729 Year
» 3213582 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
240 |
m/e |
07/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5240 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4364 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64364 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 07/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 25/07/1961 |
Service Life |
57 yrs , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1923 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 240 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
02/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5240 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4364 |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64364 |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
25/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64364 |
|
|