Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 4480 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20092 Week
» 118737 Month
» 321401 Year
» 3348254 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
282 |
m/e |
12/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5282 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4397 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64397 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 12/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/05/1960 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
5w/e |
27/03/1954 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
19/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1943 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 282 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5282 |
|
|
08/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4397 |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64397 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64397 |
|
|