Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1453 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19256 Week
» 72272 Month
» 191799 Year
» 3218652 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
289 |
m/e |
03/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5289 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4404 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64404 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 03/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/02/1961 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MEX |
Mexborough |
w/e |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
36D |
Barnsley |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1915 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1924 |
Saturated Boiler Fitted |
09/1933 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 289 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
02/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5289 |
|
|
09/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4404 |
|
|
07/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64404 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
06/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64404 |
|
|