Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3499 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16905 Week
» 69921 Month
» 189448 Year
» 3216301 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
509 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7509 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5429 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65429 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I45 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/11/1950 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1899 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Belle Vue MPD |
2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 509 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7509 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5429 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65429 but not taken up |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5429 |
|
|
12/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|