Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1119 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18922 Week
» 71938 Month
» 191465 Year
» 3218318 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
551 |
m/e |
09/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7551 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5479 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65479 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G73 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 09/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/08/1960 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Awaiting shops) |
In shops-44322/28, 45009, 64572, 64606, 65905. Awaiting shops: 65479. Shopped in previous five weeks-64552/91, 64602/27, 65297. Cut up previous five weeks- 55165/229, 57559, 61996/8, 64542/53, 65296, 68338. Being cut up: 40645/7, 57411, 57557, 64628. Awaiting cut up: 57560, 64566, 64963. 64553 was involved in an accident which resulted in a large 'tear' along the frame and although there was a possibility of repair it was scrapped in the shops. The battery rail-car is back in shops after further trials. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 551 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7551 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5479 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65479 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65479 |
|
|