Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 958 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18761 Week
» 71777 Month
» 191304 Year
» 3218157 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1158 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8158 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5508 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65508 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F48 |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 03/06/1958 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1900 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/06/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
29/06/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1158 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8158 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5508 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65508 |
|
|
03/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65508 |
|
|