Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1131 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14537 Week
» 67553 Month
» 187080 Year
» 3213933 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1192 |
m/e |
09/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8192 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5542 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65542 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B54 |
To Service |
During 09/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/05/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1192 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8192 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5542 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65542 |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65542 |
|
|