Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1827 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15233 Week
» 68249 Month
» 187776 Year
» 3214629 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1146 |
m/e |
11/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8146 |
|
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4656 |
|
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64656 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill / N. Gresley |
Class |
J19 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T77 |
To Service |
During 11/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/05/1960 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1916 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/05/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1146 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8146 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4656 |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64656 |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64656 |
|
|