Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14304 Week
» 67320 Month
» 186847 Year
» 3213700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1251 |
m/e |
10/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8251 |
|
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4671 |
|
06/1946 |
British Railways |
64671 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill / N. Gresley |
Class |
J19 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A81 |
To Service |
During 10/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 11/02/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1920 |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
32A |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1251 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8251 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4671 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64671 |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64671 |
|
|