Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4061 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17467 Week
» 70483 Month
» 190010 Year
» 3216863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1288 |
m/e |
12/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8288 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4693 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
64693 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y87 |
To Service |
During 12/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/08/1960 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1922 |
MAR |
|
March |
m/e |
01/1936 |
MAR |
|
March |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
6w/e |
25/12/1954 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
5w/e |
18/06/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/08/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
New boilers are being made for at least two non-standard classes. Those noted were:-Nos. 2446 dated 1947 on Class 'F6' No. 7225, 2447 dated 1947 waiting to go on Class 'F6' No. 7220, 4476/47 on Class 'J20/l' No. 4688 (which had previously carried a similar round top-boiler, 4477/47 on Class 'J20/1' No. 4693 and 4478/47 waiting to go on Class 'J20/1' No. 4677. The above boilers all have round-top fireboxes. |
SLS/194710 |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1288 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8288 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4693 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64693 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64693 |
|
|